Anderson v. United States of America
Court Docket Sheet

District of Arizona

3:2018-cv-08252 (azd)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/05/2018
Complaint
2
10/05/2018
Summons Submitted
3
10/05/2018
New Case Opened
4
10/05/2018
Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
10/05/2018
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/05/2018
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
10/09/2018
Summons Submitted
8
10/09/2018
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
9
10/10/2018
Summons Issued
10
12/13/2018
Order
11
12/13/2018
Service Executed
12
12/17/2018
Answer to Complaint
13
12/17/2018
Order
12/18/2018
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
12/26/2018
Stay
12/27/2018
Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
12/27/2018
Stay
18
01/15/2019
Response to Motion
19
01/22/2019
Order on Motion to Stay
20
01/29/2019
Notice (Other)
21
01/29/2019
Miscellaneous Relief
22
01/31/2019
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
23
02/26/2019
Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP
24
03/01/2019
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
03/01/2019
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
03/05/2019
Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery
27
03/19/2019
Notice (Other)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.