Andre P. Carpentier and Donna T. Carpentier
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Rhode Island (Bankruptcy)

1:2015-bk-11218 (rib)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
06/27/2018
Change of Address
10/10/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (pdf or text only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
11/09/2018
Transfer/Assignment of Claim
11/14/2018
Internet Credit Card Payment (Text entry; no document attached.)
30
11/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document
doc
04/09/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.