Andretia Floy Payne
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01879 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: 167 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
05/03/2018
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Individuals. Fee Amount $335 Filed by Andretia Floy Payne (Shinn, J.)
3
05/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Andretia Floy Payne. (Shinn, J.)
4
05/03/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Andretia Floy Payne. (Shinn, J.)
05/03/2018
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(18-01879-7) [misc,volp7] (335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22029912. Fee Amount 335.00 (re:Doc# 1) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
05/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 06/04/2018 at 03:00 PM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Objections for Discharge due by 08/03/2018.
6
05/04/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Admin adiuser)
7
05/04/2018
Order Appointing Trustee. Thomas E Reynolds added to the case. Signed on 5/4/2018.
8
05/05/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 7)). Notice Date 05/05/2018.
9
05/06/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 6 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 05/06/2018.
10
05/08/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Andretia Floy Payne. (Shinn, J.)
06/05/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution: I, Thomas E Reynolds, having been appointed trustee of the estate of the above-named debtor(s), report that I have neither received any property nor paid any money on account of this estate; that I have made a diligent inquiry into the financial affairs of the debtor(s) and the location of the property belonging to the estate; and that there is no property available for distribution from the estate over and above that exempted by law. Unless the Court orders otherwise, I deem abandoned any and all property of the estate that was scheduled in the petition and was unadministered as of the date of this report, and pursuant to Fed R Bank 5009, I hereby certify that the estate of the above-named debtor(s) has been fully administered. I request that I be discharged from any further duties as trustee. Key information about this case as reported in schedules filed by the debtor(s) or otherwise found in the case record: This case was pending for 1 months. Assets Abandoned (without deducting any secured claims): $ 0.00, Assets Exempt: $ 5650.00, Claims Scheduled: $ 41022.00, Claims Asserted: Not Applicable, Claims scheduled to be discharged without payment (without deducting the value of collateral or debts excepted from discharge): $ 41022.00. Debtor appeared. (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.