Angela Borrell v. Bloomsburg University, et al
Court Docket Sheet

3rd Circuit Court of Appeals

2015-02823 (ca3)

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael B. Kimberly on behalf of Appellee(s) Angela Borrell. [15-2823, 16-3837, 16-3959]

Case: 15-2823 Document: 003112747059 Page: 1 Date Filed: 10/09/2017 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT 15-2823, 16-3837, No. 16-3959 Angela Borrell vs. Bloomsberg University, et al. ENTRY OF APPEARANCE Please the list names of all parties represented, using additional sheet(s) if necessary: Angela Borrell Indicate the party's role IN THIS COURT (check only one): Petitioner(s) Appellant(s) Intervenor(s) Respondent(s) X Appellee(s) Amicus Curiae (Type or Print) Counsel’s Name Michael B. Kimberly X Mr. Ms. Mrs. Miss Firm Mayer Brown LLP Address 1999 K St NW City, State, Zip Code Washington, DC, 20006 Phone (202) 263-3127 Fax (202) 263-5350 Primary E-Mail Address (required) mKimberly@mayerbrown.com Additional E-Mail Address (1) wdc.docket@mayerbrown.com Additional E-Mail Address (2) Notices generated from the Court's ECF system will be sent to both the primary e-mail and additional e-mail addresses. YOU ARE LIMITED TO TWO ADDITIONAL E-MAIL ADDRESSES. SIGNATURE OF COUNSEL:/s/Michael B. Kimberly Michael B. Kimberly Case: 15-2823 Document: 003112747059 Page: 2 Date Filed: 10/09/2017 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on October 9, 2017, the foregoing was electronically filed with the Clerk of Court using the CM/ECF system, which will send notification to all counsel of record in this matter who are registered with the Court’s CM/ECF system./s/Michael B. Kimberly Michael B. Kimberly MAYER BROWN LLP 1999 K St NW Washington, DC 20006 (202) 263-3127 (tel.)

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael B. Kimberly on behalf of Appellee(s) Angela Borrell. [15-2823, 16-3959]

Case: 15-2823 Document: 003112747471 Page: 1 Date Filed: 10/10/2017 UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT No. 15-2823, 16-3959 Angela Borrell vs. Bloomsburg University, et al ENTRY OF APPEARANCE Please the list names of all parties represented, using additional sheet(s) if necessary: Angela Borrell Indicate the party's role IN THIS COURT (check only one): Petitioner(s) Appellant(s) Intervenor(s) Respondent(s) x Appellee(s) Amicus Curiae (Type or Print) Counsel’s Name Michael B. Kimberly x Mr. Ms. Mrs. Miss Firm Mayer Brown LLP Address 1999 K St NW City, State, Zip Code Washington, DC, 20006 Phone (202) 263-3127 Fax (202) 263-5350 Primary E-Mail Address (required) mKimberly@mayerbrown.com Additional E-Mail Address (1) wdc.docket@mayerbrown.com Additional E-Mail Address (2) Notices generated from the Court's ECF system will be sent to both the primary e-mail and additional e-mail addresses. YOU ARE LIMITED TO TWO ADDITIONAL E-MAIL ADDRESSES. SIGNATURE OF COUNSEL:/s/Michael B. Kimberly Michael B. Kimberly Case: 15-2823 Document: 003112747471 Page: 2 Date Filed: 10/10/2017 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I hereby certify that on October 10, 2017, the foregoing was electronically filed with the Clerk of Court using the CM/ECF system, which will send notification to all counsel of record in this matter who are registered with the Court’s CM/ECF system./s/Michael B. Kimberly Michael B. Kimberly MAYER BROWN LLP 1999 K St NW Washington, DC 20006 (202) 263-3127 (tel.)

ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: John G. Knorr, III, Esq. for Bloomsburg University and Michelle Ficca in 15-2823, 16-3837, 16-3959 will not participate in this appeal, received. [15-2823, 16-3837, 16-3959] (JGK) [Entered: 03/09/2018 03:42 PM]

Case: 15-2823 Document: 003112872382 Page: 1 Date Filed: 03/09/2018 IN THE UNITED STATES COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT ANGELA BORRELL,:::: Nos. 15-2823, 16-3827 v.: & 16-3959: BLOOMSBURG UNIVERSITY, et: al.,: Appellants MOTION TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE The undersigned moves to withdraw his appearance as counsel for Appellant/Cross-appellee Michelle Ficca in the above appeals. Substitute counsel has already entered his appearance. Respectfully submitted, /s/ John G. Knorr, III___________ JOHN G. KNORR, III Chief Deputy Attorney General Chief, Appellate Litigation Section Bar No. 21583 (Pa.) Office of Attorney General 15th Floor, Strawberry Square Harrisburg, PA 17120 Phone: (717) 787-1144 FAX: (717) 772-4526 DATE: March 9, 2010 1 Case: 15-2823 Document: 003112872382 Page: 2 Date Filed: 03/09/2018 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE I, John G. Knorr, III, Chief Deputy Attorney General, do hereby certify that I have this day served the foregoing Motion to Withdraw Appearance, via electronic service, on the following: Jaime S. Tuitte Thomas S. Giotto Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, P.C. One Oxford Centre, 20th Floor 301 Grant Street Pittsburgh, PA 15219-1041 Barry H. Dyller The Dyller Law Firm 88 North Franklin Street Wilkes-Barre, PA 18701 Michael B. Kimberly Paul W. Hughes Mayer Brown LLP 1999 K St. NW Washington, DC 20006 /s/ John G. Knorr, III___________ JOHN G. KNORR, III Chief Deputy Attorney General Chief, Appellate Litigation Section DATE: March 9, 2018 2

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
10/09/2017
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Paul W. Hughes on behalf of Appellee(s) Angela Borrell. [15-2823, 16-3837, 16-3959]
doc
10/09/2017
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael B. Kimberly on behalf of Appellee(s) Angela Borrell. [15-2823, 16-3837, 16-3959]
doc
10/10/2017
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Paul W. Hughes on behalf of Appellee(s) Angela Borrell. [15-2823, 16-3959]
doc
10/10/2017
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael B. Kimberly on behalf of Appellee(s) Angela Borrell. [15-2823, 16-3959]
doc
03/09/2018
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from J. Bart DeLone on behalf of Appellee(s) Bloomsburg University and Michelle Ficca. [16-3959, 15-2823, 16-3837] (JBD) [Entered: 03/09/2018 10:06 AM]
doc
03/09/2018
ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATING: John G. Knorr, III, Esq. for Bloomsburg University and Michelle Ficca in 15-2823, 16-3837, 16-3959 will not participate in this appeal, received. [15-2823, 16-3837, 16-3959] (JGK) [Entered: 03/09/2018 03:42 PM]
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.