Angela Elisha Czarny
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00386 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
58
07/03/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)
59
07/03/2018
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
60
07/25/2018
Certificate of No Objection
61
07/26/2018
Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments
07/26/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/26/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
62
08/10/2018
Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)
63
08/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal
64
08/14/2018
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account
08/16/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.