Angela Gwen Wridge
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00395 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/10/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
11/10/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
11/10/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
11/11/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
11/12/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/13/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
11/13/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)
7
11/14/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
8
11/15/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
9
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
11
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
11/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
13
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing
14
11/24/2018
Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)
15
11/28/2018
Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline
16
11/28/2018
Certificate of Service
17
12/04/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
18
12/11/2018
Certificate of Service
12/26/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/31/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
01/04/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
01/09/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
01/10/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
21
01/10/2019
Affidavit
22
01/12/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
23
01/14/2019
Continue / Reschedule Hearing
24
02/04/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
25
02/04/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
26
02/22/2019
Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation
27
02/26/2019
Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)
28
02/26/2019
Amended Schedules D E/F (Fee)
02/26/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
02/26/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
30
02/26/2019
Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)
31
02/26/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
32
02/28/2019
Proceeding Memo
33
02/28/2019
Audio File (Active Event)
34
03/03/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
35
03/08/2019
Certificate of Service
36
03/19/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)
37
03/21/2019
Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)
38
03/21/2019
Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)
39
03/21/2019
Certificate of Service
03/21/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
40
04/03/2019
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
41
04/08/2019
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
42
04/08/2019
Hearing
04/11/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
43
04/17/2019
Proceeding Memo

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.