Angela Kanaras
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Maryland (Bankruptcy)

1:2019-bk-10318 (mdb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/09/2019
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Angela Kanaras
10
01/09/2019
Setting Hearing (bk)
01/10/2019
Notice of Prior Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
18
03/11/2019
Chapter 13 341 Meeting Held (Batch)
19
03/27/2019
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan with Leave to Amend
23
04/08/2019
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/08/2019
Disposition Without Hearing (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
05/08/2019
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan with Leave to Amend
26
05/09/2019
Denying Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan with Leave to Amend
27
05/09/2019
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
28
05/09/2019
Certificate of Service
29
05/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
30
05/12/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.