Angela Kathleen Sanders
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Nebraska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-42065 (neb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/26/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)
2
12/26/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
3
12/26/2018
Pay Advice
4
12/26/2018
Chapter 13 Plan
5
12/26/2018
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 13
12/26/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/27/2018
Objection to Confirmation Deadline Updated (ADI) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
12/27/2018
Certificate Regarding Confirmation Chapter 12/13
8
12/27/2018
Certificate of Service of EMPLOYER TO PAY TRUSTEE (batch)
9
12/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
10
01/04/2019
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay
11
01/07/2019
Hearing Set
12
01/07/2019
Support Document
13
01/07/2019
Certificate of Service
01/22/2019
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/22/2019
Hearing Set
16
01/25/2019
Certificate of Service
17
01/29/2019
Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)
02/12/2019
Relief from Co-Debtor Stay (Text entry; no document attached.)
19
02/12/2019
Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)
02/13/2019
Meeting of Creditors Held (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
02/15/2019
Certificate of Service
21
02/25/2019
Notice of Requirement for Financial Management Course
22
02/27/2019
Certificate of Financial Management Course
02/27/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (Text entry; no document attached.)
24
02/27/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing
25
03/12/2019
Acknowledgment of Claim (batch)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.