Angela Kay Helmke
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Colorado (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-19959 (cob)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/15/2018
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Angela kay Helmke
15
01/03/2019
Notice of Possible Dividends
01/04/2019
Meeting of Creditors Satisfied (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
01/06/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Possible Dividend
17
01/22/2019
Personal Financial Management Course
18
02/25/2019
Discharge-Auto Docket

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.