Angela Rose Russell
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2018-bk-00065 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 128 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/07/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Angela Rose Russell
2
01/07/2018
Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.
3
01/07/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell
5
01/07/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.
6
01/07/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.
7
01/08/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
8
01/08/2018
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/31/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham.Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts Due 4/2/2018.Proofs of Claims due by 3/19/2018.Government Proof of Claim due by 7/6/2018.Confirmation hearing to be held on 3/6/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
9
01/08/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell).
10
01/08/2018
Notice of Deficient Filing and Show Cause Hearing Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to File Proper Schedules Incomplete Filings due by 1/22/2018. Show Cause hearing to be held on 1/30/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
11
01/09/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC.
12
01/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 8 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13). Notice Date 01/10/2018.
13
01/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Deficient Filing and Show Cause Hearing). Notice Date 01/10/2018.
14
01/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell). Notice Date 01/10/2018.
15
01/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 7 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 01/10/2018.
16
01/15/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.
17
02/01/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held 1/31/2018. (Ch13troffice, bc)
18
02/07/2018
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
19
02/07/2018
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 3/6/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
20
02/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 19 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 02/09/2018.
21
03/06/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 3/6/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 4/17/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
22
03/08/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.).
23
03/08/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.
24
03/08/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Chapter 13 Calculation of Your Disposable Income Form 122C-2, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.
25
03/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 21 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 03/08/2018.
26
03/25/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell (RE: related document(s) 22 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.).).
27
03/25/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.
28
04/10/2018
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181, Filed by Creditor American Honda Finance Corp. DBA Honda Lease Trust
04/10/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(18-00065-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21940985. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 28) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
04/10/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor American Honda Finance Corp. DBA Honda Lease Trust (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $181,).
30
04/11/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Kent D. McPhail, Attorney for American Honda Finance Corp. DBA Honda Lease Trust (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor American Honda Finance Corp. DBA Honda Lease Trust). Hearing scheduled 5/8/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
32
04/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 30 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 04/13/2018.
33
04/17/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 4/17/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation and Motion to Dismiss Case). Hearing scheduled 5/22/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
34
04/18/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mr. McPhail shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #28; Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Kent D. McPhail, Attorney for American Honda Finance Corp. DBA Honda Lease Trust
35
04/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 33 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 04/19/2018.
36
04/26/2018
Motion for In Rem Relief from Stay As to Debtor Angela Rose Russell, in addition to Motion for In Rem Relief from Co-Debtor Stay as to Co-Debtor John Russell Fee Amount $181.00 on Real Property Filed by Assurance Financial Group, LLC.
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit promissory note #
3
Exhibit Mortgage #
4
Exhibit Assignment of Mortgage) Modified on 4/26/2018 to match PDF (sva
4 Attachments
04/26/2018
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(18-00065-DSC13) [motion,mrlfsty] (181.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22002491. Fee Amount 181.00 (re:Doc# 36) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
37
04/26/2018
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor Assurance Financial Group, LLC (RE: related document(s) 36 Motion for Relief from Stay As to Debtor Angela Rose Russell, Fee Amount $181, Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay as to Co-Debtor John Russell, on Real Property).
38
04/26/2018
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for In Rem Relief from Stay and In Rem Relief from Co-Debtor Stay filed by Beth McFadden Rouse, Attorney for Assurance Financial Group, LLC (RE: related document(s) 36). Hearing scheduled 5/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
40
04/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 38 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 04/28/2018.
42
05/07/2018
Rescheduled Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Kent D. McPhail, Attorney for American Honda Finance Corp. DBA Honda Lease Trust (RE: related document(s) 28 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor American Honda Finance Corp. DBA Honda Lease Trust). Hearing scheduled 5/15/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
43
05/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 42 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 05/09/2018.
44
05/10/2018
Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay without objection (Related Doc # 28) Signed on 5/10/2018.
05/10/2018
Payment of Full Filing Fee. Fee Amount $ 310 Filed by Trustee Bradford W. Caraway. (Ch13troffice, cs) (Text entry; no document attached.)
05/10/2018
Receipt of Payment of Fee(18-00065-DSC13) [misc,feepay] (310.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22053382. Fee Amount 310.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
45
05/10/2018
Case Filing Fee Paid in Full (RE: related document(s) 9 Order to Pay Filing Fees in Installments).
46
05/12/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 44 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 05/12/2018.
47
05/17/2018
Courtroom Deputy Notes (By agreement of the parties, this matter is settled and Mrs. Rouse shall submit a proposed order.) RE: Doc #36; In Rem Motion for Relief from Stay and In Rem Motion for Relief from Co-Debtor Stay filed by Beth McFadden Rouse, Attorney Assurance Financial Group LLC
48
05/25/2018
Order Rescheduling Hearing Signed on 5/25/2018 (RE: related document(s) 8 Confirmation Hearing, 18 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 7/10/2018 at 11:15 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
doc
05/28/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan
49
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 48 Order Rescheduling Hearing). Notice Date 05/27/2018.
50
05/28/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell (RE: related document(s) 26 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell (RE: related document(s) 22 Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.).).).
51
05/28/2018
Amended Schedule I: Individual- Your Income, Amended Schedule J: Individual- Your Expenses, Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Individual, Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.
06/09/2018
Tax Documents (Text entry; no document attached.)
52
06/09/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2017 redacted Filed by Debtor Angela Rose Russell.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.