Angela Scott
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80331 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
30
09/17/2018
Limit Notice
31
09/18/2018
Limit Notice
38
01/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
42
01/29/2019
Incorrect Event (Notice of)
46
02/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.