Angelia Bailey Sheets
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Texas (Bankruptcy)

1:2019-bk-10012 (txwb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/02/2019
341 Meeting 7 (No Asset)
01/02/2019
Installment Fee Paid (NOT FINAL PAYMENT) (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
01/03/2019
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 (Court)
01/03/2019
Statement of Social Security Number (Form 21) (Restricted Document) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
01/03/2019
Pro Se Filing Questionnaire
5
01/03/2019
Certificate of Budget and Credit Counseling-First Debtor Only
6
01/03/2019
Pay Filing Fee in Installments
7
01/03/2019
BK-Pay Filing Fee in Installments (pdf)
8
01/03/2019
7 Request for 341 Meeting Notice-Ind
9
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing
10
01/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing
11
01/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing
12
01/22/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement NOT Signed by Debtor's Attorney
13
01/31/2019
Hearing (F)
14
02/02/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing
15
02/08/2019
Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate
02/11/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/06/2019
Hearing Held (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
03/06/2019
BK-Regarding Matter (pdf)
17
03/08/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.