Angelia D. Gatson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Wisconsin (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-22198 (wieb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
53
08/13/2018
Order on Stipulation for Substitution of Attorney (One document)
55
10/31/2018
Stipulation for Substitution of Attorney (One document)
61
12/27/2018
Order on Stipulation
62
12/30/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
64
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
02/21/2019
Settlement Remark (Text entry; no document attached.)
67
03/11/2019
Dismiss Case
68
03/14/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.