Angelia Delores Jones
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Tennessee (Bankruptcy)

1:2017-bk-13709 (tneb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
47
08/10/2018
Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)
09/13/2018
Hearing Held (BK) (Text entry; no document attached.)
50
09/13/2018
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)
51
09/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
52
12/26/2018
Motion and Order to Substitute Attorney (batch)
53
01/08/2019
Dismiss Case
01/31/2019
Hearing Held/Continued (BK) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/28/2019
Hearing Held (BK) (Text entry; no document attached.)
56
03/01/2019
Dismiss Case
57
03/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.