Angelia Elizabeth Harrison
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00225 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 238 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/19/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Angelia Elizabeth Harrison
2
01/19/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison.
3
01/19/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison
5
01/19/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison.
6
01/19/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison.
7
01/19/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan).
8
01/19/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison.
9
01/19/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison.
10
01/19/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/14/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 03/20/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 03/30/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/18/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/16/2018.
11
01/19/2018
Amended Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Valuation of Security. Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison.).
12
01/19/2018
Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison (RE: related document(s) 11 Amended Chapter 13 Plan).
13
01/19/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison.
14
01/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/21/2018.
01/22/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison Case Number 13-00748, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 02/20/2013, Dismissed for Other Reason on 03/04/2013; Case Number 09-00438, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/27/2009, Standard Discharge on 04/28/2009; Case Number 93-07986, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/24/1993, Dismissed for Other Reason on 01/26/1995; Case Number 89-14572, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/13/1989, Dismissed for Other Reason on 08/16/1990; Case Number 86-09963, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 12/09/1986, Dismissed for Other Reason on 07/10/1987; Case Number 90-03764, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 03/29/1990, Dismissed for Other Reason on 10/17/1990; Case Number 02-03079, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/17/2002, Standard Discharge on 02/07/2006; Case Number 00-03934, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 06/29/2000, Standard Discharge on 06/11/2001; Case Number 92-08372, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 11/05/1992; Case Number 08-00388, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/29/2008, Dismissed for failure to pay filing fee on 09/26/2008; Case Number 10-02670, Chapter 13 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 04/28/2010, Dismissed for failure to make plan payments on 02/20/2013.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
15
01/20/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
16
01/22/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison).
17
01/23/2018
Amended Order Denying Application for Payment of Filing Fees in Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor's Application to pay the filing fee in installments is hereby DENIED because filing fees from a prior case or cases are unpaid. All filing fees in the current case are due and payable. This case will be set for show cause why the case should not be dismissed for failure to pay fees by separate notice of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (Non-Image Order) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison).
18
01/23/2018
Notes: Filing fee in the amount of $281.00 not paid in case number 13-00748-TOM-13
19
01/23/2018
Notice to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Pay Filing Fee. Show Cause hearing to be held on 2/13/2018 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham.
20
01/24/2018
Trustee's Direction for Deduction. (Ch13troffice, sf)
21
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[11] Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Angelia Elizabeth Harrison). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.