Angelina Marie Sletten
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-00053 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
38
06/05/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
39
06/06/2018
Proceeding Memo
40
06/07/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
41
06/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
06/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
42
06/14/2018
Certificate of Service
43
06/18/2018
Request for Special Notice
44
06/19/2018
Relief from Stay
45
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
46
06/27/2018
Certificate of No Objection
47
06/27/2018
Certificate of Service
48
07/20/2018
Relief from Stay
49
07/22/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/24/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/24/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/30/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.