Angelina Michelle Benjamin
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2019-bk-00054 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/19/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
02/19/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
02/20/2019
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
02/20/2019
Request for Notice by Creditor
02/20/2019
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
02/20/2019
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/21/2019
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
02/21/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
02/22/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
03/05/2019
Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)
12
03/05/2019
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
13
03/05/2019
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
14
03/05/2019
Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)
15
03/05/2019
Statement of Intention for Individuals (Form 108)
16
03/05/2019
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
03/06/2019
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
03/08/2019
Entry of Appearance
03/21/2019
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
03/21/2019
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
03/26/2019
Financial Management Course Certificate

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.