Angeliqueca Re'chaundr Little
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-00253 (alnb)

Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)

Def-005 [Notice to File Certification] (Rev. 12/15) UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION In re: Case No. 18-00253-DSC13 Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little Chapter 13 SSN: xxx-xx-0700 Debtor(s) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE A CERTIFICATION ABOUT A FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT COURSE (Official Form 423) Notice is hereby given that, subject to limited exceptions, a Debtor must complete an instructional course in personal financial management in order to receive a discharge under chapter 7 (11 U.S.C. § 727) or chapter 13 (11 U.S.C. § 1328). Generally, financial course providers will file a certificate with the Court to indicate that the Debtor has completed the course. If the course provider fails to file the certificate, a Debtor must complete and file Certification About a Personal Financial Management Course (Official Form 423) pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 1007(b)(7). If Rule 1007(b)(7) requires a Debtor to file Official Form 423 and a Debtor fails to do so, the Court will not enter a discharge and will close the case. If a Debtor subsequently files a Motion to Reopen the Case to allow for the filing of the Official Form 423, the full reopening fee must be paid for filing the motion, and the fee cannot be waived. Depending on the circumstances, the Court may order the Debtor's attorney to pay the reopening fee instead of the Debtor. Dated: 01/23/2018 By: Joseph E. Bulgarella, Clerk United States Bankruptcy Court Case 18-00253-DSC13 Doc 10 Filed 01/23/18 Entered 01/23/18 08:00:04 Desc Main Document Page 1 of 1

BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[9] Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/24/2018.

United States Bankruptcy Court Northern District of Alabama In re: Case No. 18-00253-DSC Angeliqueca Re'chaundr Little Chapter 13 Debtor CERTIFICATE OF NOTICE District/off: 1126-2 User: admin Page 1 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: 309I Total Noticed: 42 Notice by first class mail was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on Jan 24, 2018. db +Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little, 403 Memphis Street, Birmingham, AL 35224-1920 tr Bradford W. Caraway, Chapter 13 Standing Trustee, P O Box 10848, Birmingham, AL 35202-0848 9613871 +ADVANCE AMERICA, % PLAZA SERVICES, LLC, 110 HAMMOND DR. STE 110, ATLANTA GA 30328-4806 9613876 ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF ALABAMA, 11 SOUTH UNION STREET, MONTGOMERY AL 36104 9613878 +BRIGHTHOUSE NETWORKS, PO BOX 31710, TAMPA FL 33631-3710 9613879 +CAPITAL ONE, PO BOX 12914, NORFOLK VA 23541-0914 9613882 +CHRIST HEALTHCENTER, PO BOX 14000, BELFAST ME 04915-4033 9613884 +CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, %ZARZAUR & SCHWART, PC, PO BOX 11366, BIRMINGHAM AL 35202-1366 9613883 +CREDIT ACCEPTANCE, 25505 WEST 12 MILE RD, SUITE 3000, SOUTHFIELD MI 48034-8331 9613885 +DEPT OF ED/582/NELNET, ATTN: CLAIMS/BANKRUPTCY, PO BOX 82505, LINCOLN NE 68501-2505 9613887 +EZ MONEY, 2040 BESSEMER ROAD, BIRMINGHAM AL 35208-3437 9613888 +GRANDVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, 3690 GRANDVIEW PKWY, BIRMINGHAM AL 35243-3326 9613889 +GREAT AMERICAN, 304 JONES BLVD STE 2599, LAS VEGAS NV 89107-2623 9613890 +LEGACY CREDIT UNION, PO BOX 55377, BIRMINGHAM AL 35255-5377 9613891 +MEDICINE PC EASTERN HO, % FIRST FEDERAL CREDIT & COLL., 24700 CHAGRIN BLVD, SUITE 205, CLEVELAND OH 44122-5662 9613892 +NATL AMER UN, POB 1780, RAPID CITY SD 57709-1780 9613893 +NELNET, PO BOX 740283, ATLANTA GA 30374-0283 9613894 +REGIONS BANK, PO BOX 10247, BIRMINGHAM AL 35202-0247 9613895 +SEALE HARRIS CLINIC PC, % FRANKLIN COLLECTION SERVICE,, PO BOX 3910, TUPELO MS 38803-3910 9613896 +ST VINCENT AL EMERGEN, % WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, 7005 MIDDLEBROOK PIKE, KNOXVILLE TN 37909-1156 9613897 +ST VINCENT EMERGENCY DEPARTMEN, % WAKEFIELD & ASSOCIATES, 7005 MIDDLEBROOK PIKE, KNOXVILLE TN 37909-1156 9613898 +ST. VINCENT WEST, % WAKEFIELD AND ASSOCIATES, PO BOX 59003, KNOXVILLE TN 37950-9003 9613900 +ST. VINCENT'S EAST, PO BOX 935339, ATLANTA GA 31193-5339 9613899 +ST. VINCENT'S EAST, 50 MEDICAL PARK EAST DRIVE, BIRMINGHAM AL 35235-3401 9613901 +ST. VINCENT'S WEST, 810 ST. VINCENT DRIVE, BIRMINGHAM AL 35205-1695 9613903 +STATE OF ALABAMA, DEPT INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS, 649 MONROE STREET, MONTGOMERY AL 36131-0001 9613904 +UAB, PO BOX 55309, BIRMINGHAM AL 35255-5309 9613905 +UAB PHYSICIANS, PO BOX 55309, BIRMINGHAM AL 35255-5309 9613907 +UAHSF MSO, AMSHER COLLECTION SRV, 4524 SOUTHLAKE PKWY, STE 15, HOOVER AL 35244-3271 9613909 +VULCAN IMAGING, % CREDIT BUREAU OF BESSEMER, 1920 3RD AVENUE N, BESSEMER AL 35020-0811 Notice by electronic transmission was sent to the following persons/entities by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center. aty E-mail/Text: ecfbirmingham@bondnbotes.com Jan 23 2018 01:40:59 Robert D. Reese, Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, PC, 600 University Park Place, Suite 510, Birmingham, AL 35209 9613872 +E-mail/Text: bankruptcy@alagasco.com Jan 23 2018 01:43:50 ALAGASCO/SPIRE, PO BOX 2224, BIRMINGHAM AL 35246-0001 9613873 +E-mail/Text: bknotice@erccollections.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:48 AT T WIRELINE, % ERC/ENHANCED RECOVERY CORP, 8014 BAYBERRY RD, JACKSONVILLE FL 32256-7412 9613874 +EDI: ATTWIREBK.COM Jan 23 2018 01:08:00 AT&T UVERSE, PO BOX 5014, CAROL STREAM IL 60197-5014 9613875 +EDI: IIC9.COM Jan 23 2018 01:08:00 ATT U-VERSE, % I C SYSTEM INC, P.O. BOX 64378, ST. PAUL MN 55164-0378 9613877 +E-mail/Text: defaultspecialty.us@bbva.com Jan 23 2018 01:42:16 BBVA COMPASS, PO BOX 10566, BIRMINGHAM AL 35296-0001 9613880 +EDI: PRA.COM Jan 23 2018 01:08:00 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA N.A., % PORTFOLIO RECOVERY, PO BOX 41067, NORFOLK VA 23541-1067 9613881 +EDI: AMSHER.COM Jan 23 2018 01:08:00 CHILDREN S HOSPITAL EMERGENCY, % AMSHER COLLECTION SRV, 4524 SOUTHLAKE PARKWAY, STE 15, HOOVER AL 35244-3271 9613886 +Fax: 614-760-4092 Jan 23 2018 01:57:40 EASY MONEY, 210 MIDFIELD ALLEY, BIRMINGHAM AL 35228-2221 9613902 +EDI: ALDEPREV.COM Jan 23 2018 01:08:00 STATE OF ALABAMA, DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, PO BOX 320001, MONTGOMERY AL 36132-0001 9613906 +EDI: AMSHER.COM Jan 23 2018 01:08:00 UAHSF MSO, % AMSHER COLLECTION SRV, 4524 SOUTHLAKE PKWY, STE 15, HOOVER AL 35244-3271 9613910 +EDI: WFFC.COM Jan 23 2018 01:08:00 WELLS FARGO, 229 LAKESHORE PKWY, BIRMINGHAM AL 35209-7108 TOTAL: 12 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (undeliverable, * duplicate) ***** 9613908* +UAHSF MSO, AMSHER COLLECTION SRV, 4524 SOUTHLAKE PARKWAY, STE 15, HOOVER AL 35244-3271 TOTALS: 0, * 1, ## 0 Addresses marked '+' were corrected by inserting the ZIP or replacing an incorrect ZIP. USPS regulations require that automation-compatible mail display the correct ZIP. Transmission times for electronic delivery are Eastern Time zone. Case 18-00253-DSC13 Doc 12 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 1 of 4 District/off: 1126-2 User: admin Page 2 of 2 Date Rcvd: Jan 22, 2018 Form ID: 309I Total Noticed: 42 ***** BYPASSED RECIPIENTS (continued) ***** I, Joseph Speetjens, declare under the penalty of perjury that I have sent the attached document to the above listed entities in the manner shown, and prepared the Certificate of Notice and that it is true and correct to the best of my information and belief. Meeting of Creditor Notices only (Official Form 309): Pursuant to Fed. R. Bank. P. 2002(a)(1), a notice containing the complete Social Security Number (SSN) of the debtor(s) was furnished to all parties listed. This official court copy contains the redacted SSN as required by the bankruptcy rules and the Judiciary's privacy policies. Date: Jan 24, 2018 Signature: /s/Joseph Speetjens _ CM/ECF NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC FILING The following persons/entities were sent notice through the court's CM/ECF electronic mail (Email) system on January 22, 2018 at the address(es) listed below: NONE. TOTAL: 0 Case 18-00253-DSC13 Doc 12 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 2 of 4 Information to identify the case: Debtor 1 Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little Social Security number or ITIN xxx−xx−0700 First Name Middle Name Last Name EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ Debtor 2 Social Security number or ITIN _ _ _ _ (Spouse, if filing) First Name Middle Name Last Name EIN _ _−_ _ _ _ _ _ _ UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ALABAMA, SOUTHERN DIVISION Date case filed for chapter 13 1/22/18 Case number: 18−00253−DSC13 Official Form 309I Notice of Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Case 12/17 For the debtors listed above, a case has been filed under chapter 13 of the Bankruptcy Code. An order for relief has been entered. This notice has important information about the case for creditors, debtors, and trustees, including information about the meeting of creditors and deadlines. Read both pages carefully. The filing of the case imposed an automatic stay against most collection activities. This means that creditors generally may not take action to collect debts from the debtors, the debtors' property, and certain codebtors. For example, while the stay is in effect, creditors cannot sue, garnish wages, assert a deficiency, repossess property, or otherwise try to collect from the debtors. Creditors cannot demand repayment from debtors by mail, phone, or otherwise. Creditors who violate the stay can be required to pay actual and punitive damages and attorney's fees. Under certain circumstances, the stay may be limited to 30 days or not exist at all, although debtors can ask the court to extend or impose a stay. Confirmation of a chapter 13 plan may result in a discharge. Creditors who assert that the debtors are not entitled to a discharge under 11 U.S.C. § 1328(f) must file a motion objecting to discharge in the bankruptcy clerk's office within the deadline specified in this notice. Creditors who want to have their debt excepted from discharge may be required to file a complaint in the bankruptcy clerk's office by the same deadline. (See line 13 below for more information.) To protect your rights, consult an attorney. All documents filed in the case may be inspected at the bankruptcy clerk's office at the address listed below or through PACER (Public Access to Court Electronic Records at www.pacer.gov). The staff of the bankruptcy clerk's office cannot give legal advice. To help creditors correctly identify debtors, debtors submit full Social Security or Individual Taxpayer Identification Numbers, which may appear on a version of this notice. However, the full numbers must not appear on any document filed with the court. Do not file this notice with any proof of claim or other filing in the case. Do not include more than the last four digits of a Social Security or Individual Taxpayer Identification Number in any document, including attachments, that you file with the court. About Debtor 1: About Debtor 2: 1. Debtor's full name Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little 2. All other names used in the last 8 years 403 Memphis Street 3. Address Birmingham, AL 35224 Robert D. Reese Contact phone 205−802−2200 Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, PC 4. Debtor's attorney Name and address 600 University Park Place Email: ecfbirmingham@bondnbotes.com Suite 510 Birmingham, AL 35209 5. Bankruptcy trustee Bradford W. Caraway Contact phone 205 323−4631 Name and address Chapter 13 Standing Trustee P O Box 10848 Birmingham, AL 35202−0848 6. Bankruptcy clerk's office Hours open: Documents in this case may be filed at this address. 8:00 a.m. − 4:00 p.m. Monday−Friday You may inspect all records filed in Robert S. Vance Federal Building this case at this office or online at 1800 5th Avenue North www.pacer.gov. Birmingham, AL 35203 Contact phone 205−714−4000 Date: 1/22/18 For more information, see page 2 > Official Form 309I Notice of Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Case page 1 Case 18-00253-DSC13 Doc 12 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 3 of 4 Debtor Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little Case number 18−00253−DSC13 7. Meeting of creditors Debtors must attend the meeting to February 21, 2018 at 09:30 AM Location: be questioned under oath. In a joint Robert S. Vance Federal Building, 1800 5th case, both spouses must attend. Avenue North, Birmingham, AL 35203 Creditors may attend, but are not The meeting may be continued or adjourned to a required to do so. later date. If so, the date will be on the court docket. 8. Deadlines Deadline to file a complaint to challenge Filing deadline: 4/23/18 The bankruptcy clerk's office must dischargeability of certain debts: receive these documents and any required filing fee by the following deadlines. You must file: • a motion if you assert that the debtors are not entitled to receive a discharge under U.S.C. § 1328(f) or • a complaint if you want to have a particular debt excepted from discharge under 11 U.S.C. § 523(a)(2) or (4). Deadline for all creditors to file a proof of claim Filing deadline: 4/2/18 (except governmental units): Deadline for governmental units to file a proof of Filing deadline: 7/23/18 claim: Deadlines for filing proof of claim: A proof of claim is a signed statement describing a creditor's claim. A proof of claim form may be obtained at www.uscourts.gov or any bankruptcy clerk's office. If you do not file a proof of claim by the deadline, you might not be paid on your claim. To be paid, you must file a proof of claim even if your claim is listed in the schedules that the debtor filed. Claims can be filed electronically through the court's website at: www.alnb.uscourts.gov/electronic−proof−claim. Secured creditors retain rights in their collateral regardless of whether they file a proof of claim. Filing a proof of claim submits the creditor to the jurisdiction of the bankruptcy court, with consequences a lawyer can explain. For example, a secured creditor who files a proof of claim may surrender important nonmonetary rights, including the right to a jury trial. Deadline to object to exemptions: Filing deadline: 30 days after the The law permits debtors to keep certain property as exempt. If you conclusion of the believe that the law does not authorize an exemption claimed, you meeting of creditors may file an objection. 9. Filing of plan The debtor has filed a plan. The plan is enclosed. The hearing on confirmation will be held on: 4/3/18 at 11:00 AM, Location: Robert S. Vance Federal Bldg, 1800 5th Ave No, Courtroom 1, Birmingham, AL 35203 10. Creditors with a foreign If you are a creditor receiving a notice mailed to a foreign address, you may file a motion asking the court to address extend the deadline in this notice. Consult an attorney familiar with United States bankruptcy law if you have any questions about your rights in this case. 11. Filing a chapter 13 Chapter 13 allows an individual with regular income and debts below a specified amount to adjust debts bankruptcy case according to a plan. A plan is not effective unless the court confirms it. You may object to confirmation of the plan and appear at the confirmation hearing. A copy of the plan, if not enclosed, will be sent to you later, and if the confirmation hearing is not indicated on this notice, you will be sent notice of the confirmation hearing. The debtor will remain in possession of the property and may continue to operate the business, if any, unless the court orders otherwise. 12. Exempt property The law allows debtors to keep certain property as exempt. Fully exempt property will not be sold and distributed to creditors, even if the case is converted to chapter 7. Debtors must file a list of property claimed as exempt. You may inspect that list at the bankruptcy clerk's office or online at www.pacer.gov. If you believe that the law does not authorize an exemption that debtors claimed, you may file an objection by the deadline. 13. Discharge of debts Confirmation of a chapter 13 plan may result in a discharge of debts, which may include all or part of a debt. However, unless the court orders otherwise, the debts will not be discharged until all payments under the plan are made. A discharge means that creditors may never try to collect the debt from the debtors personally except as provided in the plan. If you want to have a particular debt excepted from discharge under 11 U.S.C. § 523(a)(2) or (4), you must file a complaint and pay the filing fee in the bankruptcy clerk's office by the deadline. If you believe that the debtors are not entitled to a discharge of any of their debts under 11 U.S.C. § 1328(f), you must file a motion by the deadline. Official Form 309I Notice of Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Case page 2 Case 18-00253-DSC13 Doc 12 Filed 01/24/18 Entered 01/25/18 00:13:21 Desc Imaged Certificate of Notice Page 4 of 4

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: 266 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
01/22/2018
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little
2
01/22/2018
Chapter 13 Plan, and Request for Assumption of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases. Filed by Debtor Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little.
3
01/22/2018
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little
5
01/22/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed by Debtor Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little.
6
01/22/2018
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little.
7
01/22/2018
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little.
8
01/22/2018
Tax Documents for the Year for 2016 Tax Transcript Filed by Debtor Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little.
9
01/22/2018
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 02/21/2018 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 04/03/2018 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (DSC) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 04/02/2018. Government Proof of Claim due by 07/23/2018 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 04/23/2018.
01/23/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings for debtor Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little Case Number 10-00510, Chapter 7 filed in Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court on 01/29/2010, Standard Discharge on 05/25/2010.(Admin) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10
01/23/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
01/23/2018
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Angeliqueca Re'chaundra Little).
12
01/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s)[9] Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 01/24/2018.
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.