Anita Marie Richie
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00389 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/06/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
11/06/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
3
11/06/2018
Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)
11/06/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
QC Remark (generic) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/06/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/07/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
11/08/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
8
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
9
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
10
11/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
11/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
11/21/2018
Extend Time
13
11/27/2018
Extend Time
14
11/29/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
15
11/30/2018
Request for Notice by Creditor
16
12/04/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
17
12/04/2018
Schedule G (Form 106G & 206G)
18
12/04/2018
Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)
19
12/04/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
12/04/2018
Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
12/13/2018
Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)
21
12/13/2018
Proceeding Memo
22
12/14/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
12/14/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/14/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
23
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.