Ann Truex
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00308 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
09/17/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)
2
09/17/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
09/17/2018
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
09/18/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
09/18/2018
Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)
09/18/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
09/18/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)
5
09/18/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)
6
09/18/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)
7
09/18/2018
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)
09/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
8
09/19/2018
Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2
09/19/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
9
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
11
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
12
09/24/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
10/18/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/18/2018
Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01) (Text entry; no document attached.)
13
12/18/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.