Anna L. Jaimes Gonzales
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of California (Bankruptcy)

9:2019-bk-90140 (caeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/19/2019
Voluntary Petition - 7
02/19/2019
First Meeting - 7 (Text entry; no document attached.)
2
02/19/2019
Appointment of Interim Trustee - Including Amended Appointment (Produces Form)
3
02/19/2019
Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case
02/19/2019
Statement of Social Security Number(s) (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
02/19/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments
6
02/19/2019
Pay Filing Fees in Installments (Links to Application to Pay Installments)
7
02/20/2019
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
8
02/20/2019
341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only
9
02/21/2019
BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case
12
02/23/2019
BNC Service of Notice of Incomplete Filing and Notice of Intent to Dismiss Case (Certificate)
15
03/02/2019
341 Meeting - Chapter 7 Only (Duplicate) (Certificate)
24
03/12/2019
Notice of Payment Due (A/R) - Including Amended
25
03/13/2019
Amended Notice of Hearing
29
04/06/2019
Notice of Trustee's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Appear (Certificate)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.