Anna Lee Lowe
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Texas (Bankruptcy)

4:2018-bk-41433 (txeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/02/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Anna lee Lowe
5
08/04/2018
Certificate of Mailing
12
10/17/2018
Certificate of Mailing
11/29/2018
Chapter 13 Confirmation Hearing Rescheduled (Amended Plan) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
12/26/2018
Automatic Stay (for Relief from Stay) and Co-Debtor Stay Combined
21
12/28/2018
Confirmation Report, Witness and Exhibit List
01/09/2019
Chapter 13 Confirmation Hearing Continued - Without Form (Text entry; no document attached.)
22
01/10/2019
Relief from Stay and Co-Debtor Stay Combined
23
01/12/2019
Certificate of Mailing
24
01/18/2019
Certification (Debtor Status of Post-Petition Obligations) - CH. 13
25
01/18/2019
Amended Schedules and/or Amended Matrix
01/25/2019
POrder Note (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
01/28/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
27
01/30/2019
Certificate of Service
28
02/04/2019
Striking Schedule C
29
02/06/2019
Certificate of Mailing
30
02/19/2019
Amended Schedules and/or Amended Matrix
02/22/2019
Declaration For Electronic Filing (Text entry; no document attached.)
31
03/15/2019
Dismiss Chapter 13 Case by Trustee and Setting Hearing
32
03/17/2019
Certificate of Mailing
04/16/2019
Hearing Continued (Courtroom) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.