Anna Mildred Miller
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Nebraska (Bankruptcy)

8:2013-bk-80453 (neb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
109
11/19/2018
Certificate of Final Payment (Batch)
110
11/27/2018
Certificate Regarding Chapter 13 Discharge
111
12/12/2018
Discharging Debtor(s)
112
12/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge
113
01/16/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account (batch)
114
01/16/2019
Chapter 13 Trustees Notice of Final Report (batch)
115
01/18/2019
Status Report
116
01/18/2019
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
117
01/18/2019
Certificate of Service
02/18/2019
Close Bankruptcy Case 7 13 (Autodocket) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.