Anna Mishelle Yakubson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Southern District of Ohio (Bankruptcy)

2:2017-bk-57934 (ohsb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/14/2017
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Anna Mishelle Yakubson
13
08/30/2018
Reopen Case
14
09/28/2018
Reopen Case
15
09/28/2018
Re-appointment of Trustee in a Reopened Case
16
10/01/2018
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
10/16/2018
Notice of Assets (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/17/2018
Notice to File Proof of Claim
18
10/20/2018
Certificate of Mailing - BNC
19
10/29/2018
Interim Report (batch)
20
11/08/2018
Employ
21
12/11/2018
Employ
22
12/12/2018
Compensation
23
12/14/2018
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
24
01/07/2019
Withdrawal
25
02/06/2019
Chapter 7 Final Report-Asset
02/07/2019
Notice to Trustee Regarding Outstanding Fees (Text entry; no document attached.)
26
02/07/2019
Notice of Chapter 7 Final Report
27
03/18/2019
Distribution
28
03/21/2019
Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC
04/02/2019
Receipt for Filing Fee - Generic (Text entry; no document attached.)
29
05/14/2019
Chapter 7 Final Account-Asset (batch)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.