Anna Nhung Nguyen
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Hawaii (Bankruptcy)

1:2017-bk-00723 (hib)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/30/2018
Relief from Automatic Stay (Motion) (FEE 181)
1
07/21/2017
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Anna Nhung Nguyen
doc
05/30/2018
Certificate of Service
29
06/30/2018
Modify Confirmed Plan (Motion)
30
06/30/2018
Certificate of Service
07/27/2018
Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/27/2018
Withdrawal of Motion, Objection, or Other Document (Text Entry - No PDF) (Text entry; no document attached.)
35
08/03/2018
Declaration and Request for Entry of Order
36
08/13/2018
Relief from Automatic Stay
38
11/09/2018
Ch 13 - Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)
40
12/04/2018
Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.