Anna Nicole Figuero
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Ohio (Bankruptcy)

1:2018-bk-16717 (ohnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
11/07/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Anna Nicole Figuero
16
02/05/2019
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
17
02/08/2019
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
18
02/08/2019
Notice of Transfer of Claim other than for Security
19
02/19/2019
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (PDF)
20
02/22/2019
Notice of Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.