Anna P. Sutter
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Connecticut (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-31023 (ctb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
7
07/03/2018
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor
8
07/03/2018
Form 122
9
07/03/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
10
07/03/2018
Chapter 13 Plan
13
07/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
15
07/19/2018
Request for Notices
08/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/03/2018
Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed (Text entry; no document attached.)
17
10/03/2018
Objection to Confirmation of Plan
doc
10/04/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
18
10/08/2018
Notice of Appearance
23
10/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing
24
11/27/2018
Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors
25
11/27/2018
Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan
26
11/27/2018
Ch 13 Wage Withholding/Employer Information Sheet
29
12/04/2018
Amended/Modified Chapter 13 Plan
30
12/04/2018
Ch 13 Wage Withholding/Employer Information Sheet
12/06/2018
Hearing Set (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/08/2018
Hearing Held (Text entry; no document attached.)
34
12/10/2018
Confirming Chapter 13 Plan
35
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.