Anna Puchar
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

6:2018-bk-07790 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
12/17/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
12/17/2018
Statement of Social Security Numbers (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
12/17/2018
Certificate Of Credit Counseling
12/18/2018
Prior Bankruptcy Case(s) (Text entry; no document attached.)
4
12/18/2018
341 Mtg. Notice - Ch 7 Indiv. No Asset
12/18/2018
(NO PAPER) - 521 Compliance Entry (Text entry; no document attached.)
5
12/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
7
01/08/2019
Notice Of Change of Address - Debtor
01/28/2019
Report of No Distribution - Ch 7 - No Funds (No Paper) (Text entry; no document attached.)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.