Anna R Harris
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Florida (Bankruptcy)

3:2015-bk-03076 (flmb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
47
06/14/2018
TRUSTEE - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)
48
06/15/2018
Order Compelling Debtor to Provide Annual Tax Returns
49
06/18/2018
Proof of Service
50
08/08/2018
TRUSTEE - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)
51
08/08/2018
Order Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)
52
08/09/2018
Proof of Service
53
09/17/2018
Notice Of Change of Address - Party
54
10/19/2018
Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan
57
11/20/2018
Proof of Service
58
12/10/2018
TRUSTEE - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)
59
12/11/2018
Order Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)
60
12/12/2018
Proof of Service
01/11/2019
COURT - (NO PAPER) Substitution of Counsel (Attorney Roll Clerk Only) (Text entry; no document attached.)
61
01/23/2019
Notice of Change of Payment Address of Creditor
62
03/05/2019
Notice of Change of Payment Address of Creditor
63
03/19/2019
Notice Of Increase in Plan Payments
64
03/20/2019
TRUSTEE - Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)
65
03/20/2019
Order Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Case (batch)
66
03/21/2019
Proof of Service
68
04/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Transferor of Filing of Transfer of Claim

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.