Anna R Williams
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Middle District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

1:2017-bk-11009 (almb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
27
12/31/2018
Relief from Stay
29
01/02/2019
Set Hearing
30
01/05/2019
BNC Certificate of Service - Telephone Hearing
31
02/04/2019
Relief from Stay
33
02/07/2019
BNC Certificate of Service

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.