Anna Rae Weems Sawyer
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Western District of Louisiana (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-31081 (lawb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/12/2018
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Anna rae Weems Sawyer
10
07/24/2018
CM/ECF ADI Notice of 341 and Confirmation - Do Not Use
13
08/11/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
11/16/2018
Autodocket US Treasury Receipt (Text entry; no document attached.)
25
12/10/2018
Relief from Stay
26
12/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
27
01/03/2019
Dismiss Case by Trustee for Failure to Make Plan Payments - Batch
32
02/13/2019
Certificate of Service
33
03/18/2019
Order Approving Modification of a Confirmed Plan
34
03/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.