Annie Mae Epps-Isaac
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of South Carolina (Bankruptcy)

3:2016-bk-03791 (scb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
07/27/2018
Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges
1
07/29/2016
Chapter 13 Bankruptcy Petition of Annie mae Epps-isaac
38
10/22/2018
Order
40
03/11/2019
Dismiss Case for Non-Compliance
41
03/11/2019
Proposed Order - Dismiss for Non-Payment
42
03/13/2019
Dismiss Case for Non-Compliance (order)
43
03/16/2019
Certificate of Service BNC Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.