Anron Rashad Reynolds
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

2:2016-bk-03475 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
View docket sheet
Last full docket sheet refresh: 124 days ago. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
08/25/2016
Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition Individual. Receipt Number O, Fee Amount $310 Filed by Anron Rashad Reynolds
2
08/25/2016
Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds.
3
08/25/2016
Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments Through the Chapter 13 Trustee Assigned to the Case Filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds
5
08/25/2016
Certificate of Credit Counseling for Debtor Filed Filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds.
6
08/25/2016
Employee Income Records Filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds.
7
08/25/2016
Notice of Intent to Pay Chapter 13 Case Filing Fee through Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds.
8
08/25/2016
Tax Documents for the Year for 2015 Filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds.
9
08/25/2016
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 09/28/2016 at 09:30 AM at Creditor Meeting Room Birmingham. Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/27/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 3 (TOM) Birmingham. Proof of Claim due by 12/27/2016. Government Proof of Claim due by 02/21/2017 Objection to Dischargeability of Certain Debts due by 11/28/2016.
10
08/26/2016
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management. (Admin)
11
08/26/2016
Order Approving Application for Payment of Filing Fees In Installments: IT IS ORDERED that the Debtor may pay the filing fee in installments as proposed in the application. A discharge shall not be granted until the filing fee has been paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all installments of the filing fee must be paid in full before the Debtor or Trustee may make further payments to an attorney or any other person who renders services to the Debtor in connection with the case. (Fee Amount $310.00) (RE: related document(s) 3 Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds).
12
08/26/2016
Trustee's Direction for Deduction.
13
08/27/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Notice Date 08/27/2016.
14
08/28/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 2 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds). Notice Date 08/28/2016.
15
08/28/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 10 Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management). Notice Date 08/28/2016.
16
08/29/2016
Amended Notice of Confirmation Hearing (RE: related document(s) 9 Meeting (AutoAssign Chapter 13)). Confirmation hearing to be held on 10/25/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham.
17
08/31/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 16 Notice of Confirmation Hearing). Notice Date 08/31/2016.
18
09/02/2016
Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176, Filed by Creditor NICHOLAS FINANCIAL, INC.
1
Affidavit #
2
Exhibit
2 Attachments
19
09/02/2016
Fact Summary for a Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Creditor NICHOLAS FINANCIAL, INC. (RE: related document(s) 18 Motion for Relief from Stay, Fee Amount $176,).
09/02/2016
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay(16-03475-TOM13) [motion,mrlfsty] (176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 19775047. Fee Amount 176.00 (re:Doc# 18) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
09/06/2016
Notice of Final Hearing on Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Nicholas Financial, Inc. RE: related document(s) 18 Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Creditor NICHOLAS FINANCIAL, INC.). Hearing scheduled 9/27/2016 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham.
22
09/08/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 20 Hearing (Motion for Relief) Set). Notice Date 09/08/2016.
23
09/28/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/27/2016 10:24:20 AM ]. File Size [ 226 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:38 ]. (RE: Doc #18; Motion for Relief from Stay Filed by Leonard Math, Attorney for Nicholas Financial, Inc.). (adiuser).
24
09/28/2016
Meeting of Creditors Held 9/28/2016. (Ch13troffice, jc)
25
10/03/2016
Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Chapter 13 Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss. (Ch13troffice, km)
26
10/03/2016
Order Conditionally Denying Motion For Relief From Stay (Related Doc # 18) Signed on 10/3/2016.
27
10/03/2016
Notice of Hearing on (RE: related document(s) 25 Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of Plan, Trustee's Motion to Dismiss). Hearing scheduled 10/25/2016 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 1 (TOM) Birmingham.
28
10/05/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 26 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Notice Date 10/05/2016.
29
10/05/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 27 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/05/2016.
30
10/07/2016
Amended Chapter 13 Plan Filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds.
31
10/26/2016
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/25/2016 11:09:01 AM ]. File Size [ 230 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:00:38 ]. (Confirmation Hearing). (adiuser).
32
10/27/2016
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
33
11/09/2016
Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan Signed on 11/9/2016 (RE: related document(s) 25 Trustees Objection to Confirmation is overruled and Motion to Dismiss is denied, 30 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Anron Rashad Reynolds).
34
11/11/2016
BNC Certificate of Notice (RE: related document(s) 33 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan). Notice Date 11/11/2016.
11/21/2016
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 234.00 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
11/21/2016
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-03475-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (234.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20062488. Fee Amount 234.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/22/2016
Payment of Installment Fee. Fee Amount $ 76.00 Filed by Trustee C. David Cottingham (Acting). (Ch13troffice, ct) (Text entry; no document attached.)
12/22/2016
Receipt of Payment of Fee(16-03475-TOM13) [misc,feepay] (76.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20171740. Fee Amount 76.00 (re:Doc# ) (U.S. Treasury) (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.