Anthoney v. Williams et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2000-cv-00119 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
150
05/31/2018
Status Report
151
06/01/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
152
06/15/2018
Extension of Time to File Document
153
06/15/2018
Affidavit
06/19/2018
~Util - Terminate Motions (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
06/19/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines (Text entry; no document attached.)
155
06/29/2018
Response to Order
156
06/29/2018
Affidavit
157
06/29/2018
Response to Order
07/03/2018
Notice Re: Chamber Copy (Text entry; no document attached.)
159
07/17/2018
~Util - Set Deadlines
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.