Anthony B Carlson
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Utah (Bankruptcy)

2:2019-bk-20675 (utb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/06/2019
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Petition of Anthony b Carlson
6
02/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
12
03/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Service - Notice
14
05/15/2019
Discharging Debtor(s) (order) (AUTO)
15
05/17/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.