Anthony C. Feldman and Valerie Feldman
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of New Hampshire (Bankruptcy)

1:2014-bk-11984 (nhb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
40
07/25/2018
Dismiss Case
41
08/15/2018
Notice of Withdrawal of Document
42
09/19/2018
Affidavit of Compliance with Discharge Requirements (batch)
43
09/19/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee INTERIM Report Upon Completion of Plan Payments(batch)
44
09/19/2018
Discharging Debtor Ch13
45
09/20/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
46
10/31/2018
Chapter 13 Trustee FINAL Report and Account
48
12/07/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice (BK)

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.