Anthony C. Fricano and Kim M. Fricano
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Wisconsin (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-25134 (wieb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/23/2018
Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)
doc
05/23/2018
Meeting of Creditors 13
doc
05/23/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
doc
05/23/2018
Payment Advices
05/24/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filing (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
Order for Proposed Deficiency
05/25/2018
Defective Filing Notification - Notice Regarding Service of Chapter 13 Plan (Represented Debtors) (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
doc
05/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
doc
05/29/2018
Certificate of Service
18
06/29/2018
Certificate of Service
28
09/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
31
01/21/2019
Notice of Change of Address

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.