Anthony C. Valentine and Lacey D. Valentine
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Wyoming (Bankruptcy)

2:2019-bk-20067 (wyb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
02/17/2019
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
02/17/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
3
02/17/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling
4
02/17/2019
Certificate of Credit Counseling
5
02/17/2019
Employee Income Records
02/17/2019
Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors 7 (Text entry; no document attached.)
7
02/19/2019
Notice of Incomplete Filing
8
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors
9
02/21/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing
10
02/22/2019
Employee Income Records
11
03/03/2019
Financial Management Course
12
03/03/2019
Financial Management Course
03/26/2019
Chapter 7 Trustees Initial Report (Text entry; no document attached.)
14
04/03/2019
Directive
15
04/09/2019
Notice of Assets and Request to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim
16
04/09/2019
Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim
17
04/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing
18
04/15/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement
19
04/18/2019
Reaffirmation Agreement
20
04/22/2019
Scheduling Hearing
21
04/24/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document
22
05/08/2019
Minutes of Proceedings
23
05/08/2019
Order
24
05/09/2019
Approving Reaffirmation Agreement
25
05/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.