Anthony Carl Fields and Kelsey Arnell Fields
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Eastern District of Texas (Bankruptcy)

4:2016-bk-40388 (txeb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/18/2018
Discharging Chapter 13 Trustee (Converted Case)
61
06/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge
62
07/09/2018
Reopen Chapter 7 Case
63
07/11/2018
Reopen Chapter 7 Case
66
07/13/2018
Certificate of Mailing
67
07/15/2018
Certificate of Mailing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.