Anthony Carnes and Yvonne Carnes
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Oregon (Bankruptcy)

3:2013-bk-35053 (orb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
28
09/13/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic
30
10/01/2018
Notice of Completion of Plan Payments and Filing Deadlines
34
10/28/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic
35
12/06/2018
Reopen Chapter 13 Case [Requires LBF 1367.92 - 12/1/16
42
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic
43
12/08/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic
44
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic
45
01/30/2019
Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Account and Report

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.