Anthony Darnell Horton
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-02119 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/22/2018
Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management
05/22/2018
Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings (Text entry; no document attached.)
doc
05/24/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
07/09/2018
Incorrect Event (Notice of) (Text entry; no document attached.)
27
07/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Held
33
08/01/2018
Courtroom Notes Continuing/Rescheduling

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.