Anthony J. Moscato and Cathy Anne Surges-Moscato
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of California (Bankruptcy)

4:2013-bk-44148 (canb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
51
08/13/2018
Domestic Support Obligations
52
08/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling
doc
10/18/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change
64
11/14/2018
Discharging Chapter 12/13 Trustee and Final Decree After Case Completion
66
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
67
11/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing
71
12/01/2018
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Electronic Order
74
12/26/2018
Value Collateral Under Sections 506 and 3012
75
12/26/2018
Opportunity for Hearing
76
01/02/2019
Discharging Chapter 12/13 Trustee and Final Decree After Case Completion
77
01/03/2019
Declaration
79
01/04/2019
BNC Certificate of Mailing

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.