Anthony Michael Pisano and Tracy McBride Pisano
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00134 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
15
06/13/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
06/13/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
07/11/2018
Financial Management Course Certificate
17
07/26/2018
Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)
07/26/2018
Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
07/31/2018
Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)
19
08/02/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge
08/03/2018
Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.