Anthony-Pierre v. JBER Exchange et al
Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska

3:2016-cv-00023 (akd)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
43
06/15/2018
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
44
06/18/2018
Judgment
45
08/30/2018
Notice (Other)
46
09/17/2018
Notice of Appeal
47
09/24/2018
USCA Case Number
09/24/2018
USCA Scheduling Order (Text entry; no document attached.)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.