Anthony Walter Reetz
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00218 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Sign up to receive real-time updates
Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
07/11/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
07/11/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
07/11/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/11/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
07/12/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
07/12/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
8
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
07/14/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
07/18/2018
Request for Special Notice
13
07/25/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
14
07/25/2018
Entry of Appearance
15
08/02/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
08/08/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
16
08/16/2018
Proceeding Memo
17
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
09/05/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
09/13/2018
Dismissing Case (SA)
19
09/14/2018
Proceeding Memo
09/14/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
09/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
21
09/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.