Anthony Walter Reetz
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2018-bk-00368 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
1
10/24/2018
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)
2
10/24/2018
Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)
10/24/2018
SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/24/2018
Petition Review Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
10/25/2018
Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice) (Text entry; no document attached.)
6
10/25/2018
Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)
7
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
8
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion
9
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor
10
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors
11
10/27/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
12
11/01/2018
Request for Special Notice
13
11/08/2018
Extend Time
14
11/08/2018
Extend Time
15
11/10/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
16
11/21/2018
Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)
17
11/21/2018
Extend Time
11/27/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
18
11/29/2018
Entry of Appearance
19
11/29/2018
Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)
12/03/2018
341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo) (Text entry; no document attached.)
20
12/13/2018
Setting Hearing (SA)
21
12/15/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.