Antonio D. Drake
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

2:2018-bk-01828 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/18/2018
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
doc
05/19/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
26
07/09/2018
Notice of Hearing - Van002
29
07/13/2018
Bench Sheet from Confirmation Hearing
08/09/2018
Installments Completed (Text entry; no document attached.)
41
12/14/2018
Relief from Stay
42
12/17/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.