April Lynne Mielke
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80212 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
doc
05/21/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
32
08/25/2018
Limit Notice
01/16/2019
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card (Text entry; no document attached.)
44
01/17/2019
Convert Case
45
01/17/2019
Appointing Trustee
47
01/20/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.