Aqua Marine Enterprises, Inc.
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

Northern District of Alabama (Bankruptcy)

8:2018-bk-80464 (alnb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
217
12/09/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
223
12/16/2018
BNC Certificate of Notice
228
12/24/2018
Amended Disclosure Statement
229
12/24/2018
Amended Chapter 11 Plan
230
12/26/2018
Matrix Filed
231
12/28/2018
Operating Report (DIP)
245
02/11/2019
BNC Certificate of Notice
252
03/13/2019
Compensation

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.