Aqua Pesca, LLC
Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet

District of Alaska (Bankruptcy)

3:2017-bk-00065 (akb)

Interested in this case?

Last full docket sheet refresh: None. Refresh now
#
Datesort arrow up
Description
53
06/05/2018
Memorandum Decision (SA)
54
06/06/2018
Generic Motion
06/11/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
55
06/26/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
56
06/27/2018
Objection to Claim (CM44-COAwith)
57
08/15/2018
Objection / Opposition (Generic - use when specific objection event not listed)
58
08/17/2018
Claims (SA)
59
08/17/2018
Proceeding Memo
08/17/2018
Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines) (Text entry; no document attached.)
60
08/17/2018
Audio File (Active Event)
61
08/23/2018
Employ (CM41)
62
08/24/2018
Employ
09/11/2018
Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag (Text entry; no document attached.)
63
09/14/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
64
09/20/2018
Compensation / Professional Fees
65
10/31/2018
Report of Sale
66
11/01/2018
Trustees Final Report (TFR)
67
11/01/2018
Notice of Trustees Final Report and Application for Compensation (NFR) (CM43-COAwith)
68
11/02/2018
Certificate of Service
11/28/2018
Terminate Deadline (Text entry; no document attached.)
69
11/29/2018
Certificate of No Objection

Interested in this case?

Would you like this case removed from DocketBird? Request removal.